Kansas, State of et al v. United States Attorney General et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Toby Crouse |
Referred: | Teresa J James |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01086 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Arkansas Eastern, 2:24-cv-00088 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2024 4:50 AM CDT |
Amicus
March for Our Lives
|
|
Amicus
Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
|
|
Amicus
Everytown for Gun Safety
|
|
Amicus
Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Ohio, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
South Dakota, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Montana, State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nebraska, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
New Hampshire, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
North Dakota, State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oklahoma, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
South Carolina, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Kentucky, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Tennessee, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Virginia, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
West Virginia, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Wyoming State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Missouri, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Maxey
|
|
Plaintiff
Kansas, State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Journey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iowa, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Indiana, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Idaho, State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Georgia, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Chisholm Trail Antique Gun Association
|
|
Plaintiff
Allen Black
|
|
Plaintiff
Alaska, State of
|
|
Plaintiff
Alabama, State of
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Arkansas, State of
Terminated: 05/23/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
180 | 180
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/05 1:19 PM
ORDER granting179 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to171 Memorandum in Support of170 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply deadline 9/18/2024. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 9/5/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) |
|
179 | 179
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/05 11:35 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to171 Memorandum in Support of Motion,170 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Attorney General, United States Department of Justice (Sherwood, Zachary) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Thu 09/05 12:19 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 179 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 171 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 170 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(hmg) |