State of Kansas, et al v. Garland, et al
Original Case: 6:24-cv-01086
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-03101 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 24, 2024 2:16 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN M. DETTELBACH, in his official capacity, as the Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MERRICK B. GARLAND, in his official capacity, as the United States Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF OKLAHOMA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHISHOLM TRAIL ANTIQUE GUN ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DONALD MAXEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALLEN BLACK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PHILLIP JOURNEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF WYOMING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF TENNESSEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF KANSAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF NEBRASKA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF MONTANA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF MISSOURI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF KENTUCKY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF IOWA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF INDIANA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF IDAHO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF GEORGIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF ALASKA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
STATE OF ALABAMA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/24/2024 2:16 AM MDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
[11106204] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/19/2024 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 08/05/2024 for Allen Black, Chisholm Trail Antique Gun Association, Phillip Journey, Donald Maxey, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Virginia, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming. Notice of appearance due on 08/05/2024 for Steven M. Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland and United States Department of Justice. 24-3101 | ||
Att: 1 52 pgs Preliminary Record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |