678
|
|
678
notice
Entry of Order (BK)
Fri 09/13 1:34 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for NCI to Object to HERC Rentals Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
677
|
|
677
answer
Response
Fri 09/13 12:59 PM
Response Reservation of Rights of Triple Flag USA Royalties Ltd. and Triple Flag Mining Finance Bermuda Ltd. Regarding Sale and First Supplemental Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of TF R&S CANADA LTD., TF R&S CANADA LTD., TRIPLE FLAG INTERNATIONAL LTD., TRIPLE FLAG USA ROYALTIES Related [+] (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH)
|
676
|
|
676
order
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)
Fri 09/13 11:44 AM
Order Granting Stipulation To Extend Time For NCI To Object To Herc Rentals Motion For Relief From Automatic Stay Related [+] (nac)
|
675
|
|
675
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/13 9:31 AM
Stipulation By 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. and Between HERC RENTALS, INC. to Extend Time for NCI to Object to HERC Rentals' Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
674
|
|
674
misc
Document
Wed 09/11 5:13 PM
Document Province, LLC's Monthly Fee Statement of Services Rendered and Expenses Incurred for the Period From July 2, 2024 through July 31, 2024 Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
|
673
|
|
673
misc
Document
Wed 09/11 4:59 PM
Document Fox Rothschild LLP's Monthly Fee Statement of Services Rendered and Expenses Incurred for the Period from July 1, 2024 through July 31, 2024 Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
|
672
|
|
672
misc
Document
Wed 09/11 4:57 PM
Document Lowenstein Sandler LLP's First Monthly Fee Statement of Services Rendered and Expenses Incurred for the Period from July 1, 2024 Through July 31, 2024 Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
|
671
|
|
671
notice
Entry of Order (BK)
Wed 09/11 4:07 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Shortening Time Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
670
|
|
670
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/11 11:37 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL LEHNERS on behalf of ENGINOVA, INC. Related [+] (LEHNERS, MICHAEL)
|
669
|
|
669
notice
Perfection of Lien
Wed 09/11 11:31 AM
Notice of Perfection of Lien Filed by MICHAEL LEHNERS on behalf of ENGINOVA, INC. (LEHNERS, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
|
668
|
|
668
order
Shortening Time (Bk)
Wed 09/11 10:45 AM
Order Shortening Time Hearing scheduled 9/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (nac)
|
667
|
|
667
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (BK)
Wed 09/11 10:20 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 9/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (nac)
|
666
|
|
666
ans
Joinder
Wed 09/11 9:35 AM
Joinder of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Nevada Copper, Inc.'s Objection to Trisura Insurance Company's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
|
665
|
|
665
answer
Objection
Tue 09/10 7:15 PM
Objection Nevada Copper, Inc.'s Objection to Trisura Insurance Company's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
664
|
|
664
notice
Entry of Order (BK)
Tue 09/10 4:56 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Shortening Time Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
663
|
|
663
order
Shortening Time (Bk)
Tue 09/10 10:18 AM
Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 9/16/2024 at 01:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (nac)
|
662
|
|
662
misc
Document
Tue 09/10 10:11 AM
Document Master Service List as of September 10, 2024 Filed by EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING, LLC (EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING, LLC (sg))
Related: [-]
|
661
|
|
661
misc
Declaration (BK)
Tue 09/10 7:20 AM
Declaration Of: Jeremy B. Duke, Esq. Second Supplement to Amended Declaration with Certificate of Service Filed by KIRBY C. GRUCHOW JR. on behalf of Jeremy B. Sierra Pacific Power Company d/b/a NV Energy Duk Related [+] (GRUCHOW, KIRBY)
|
660
|
|
660
notice
Notice (BK)
Mon 09/09 3:39 PM
Notice of Cancellation of Auction and Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder as Successful Bidder Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. (WORKS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
659
|
|
659
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Mon 09/09 1:37 PM
Supplemental Notice of Appearance , Supplemental Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of TRIPLE FLAG USA ROYALTIES (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
|
658
|
|
658
misc
Attorney Information Sheet (Bk)
Fri 09/06 6:36 PM
Attorney Information Sheet for Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Form, Manner, and Sufficiency of Notice of Bar Date to Unknown Creditors for Filing Proofs of Claim Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
657
|
|
657
misc
Declaration (BK)
Fri 09/06 6:32 PM
Declaration Of: Ryan J. Works, Esq. in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
656
|
|
656
8
pgs
motion
Order Shortening Time (Bk)
Fri 09/06 6:26 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Form, Manner, and Sufficiency of Notice of Bar Date to Unknown Creditors for Filing Proofs of Claim with Proposed Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+](WORKS, RYAN)
|
655
|
|
655
motion
Miscellaneous Application (Bk)
Fri 09/06 6:21 PM
Application Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Form, Manner, and Sufficiency of Notice of Bar Date to Unknown Creditors for Filing Proofs of Claim with Proposed Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. (WORKS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
654
|
|
654
motion
Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/06 5:00 PM
Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and/or Disclosure Statement DEBTORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER EXTENDING THE EXCLUSIVE PERIODS DURING WHICH ONLY THE DEBTORS MAY FILE A CHAPTER 11 PLAN AND SOLICIT ACCEPTANCES THEREOF with Proposed Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. (WORKS, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
653
|
|
653
notice
Entry of Order (BK)
Fri 09/06 2:29 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Approving Stipulation Extending the Challenge Period for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Under the Final DIP Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of 0607792 B.C. LTD., LION IRON CORP., NC DITCH COMPANY LLC, NC FARMS LLC, NEVADA COPPER CORP., NEVADA COPPER, INC. Related [+] (WORKS, RYAN)
|
652
|
|
652
misc
Supplement
Fri 09/06 1:28 PM
Supplement to Amended Objection to Assignment with Certificate of Service Filed by KIRBY C. GRUCHOW JR. on behalf of Jeremy B. Sierra Pacific Power Company d/b/a NV Energy Duk Related [+] (GRUCHOW, KIRBY)
|
| |
Att: 1
Affidavit Supplement to Amended Declaration
|
651
|
|
651
order
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)
Fri 09/06 8:15 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending The Challenge Period For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Under The Final Dip Order Related [+] (nac)
|