NC FARMS LLC (JNT - LEAD CASE #24-50566)
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-50566
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-50566
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-50569 |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NC FARMS LLC
61 E Pursel Ln
Yerington, NV 89447-9517 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
trustee
341 Meeting Concluded - Assets (11)
Tue 07/16 11:18 PM
341 Meeting Concluded (DAY, JARED) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 06/20 9:48 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Electronically Certified Copy([LINK 24-50569 hlb] ) [misc,reqcercp] ( 12.00). Receipt number A21855380, fee amount $ 12.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Request for Electronically Certified Copy
Thu 06/20 9:47 AM
Request for Electronically Certified Copy. Fee Amount $12 Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of NC FARMS LLC (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/18 10:08 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING, LLC (EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING, LLC (sg)) |
|
10 | 10
order
Joint Administration
Tue 06/18 9:42 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration with case 3:24-bk-50566 Combined Matrix Due 7/2/2024. (nac) |
|
utility
Remark (Bk)
Tue 06/18 9:43 AM
Remark, An Order has been entered in this case under Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the Chapter 11 cases of Nevada Copper, Inc., Nevada CopperCorp. (5323) (British Columbia); NC Ditch Company LLC, NC Farms LLC, LionIron Corp., and 0607792 B.C. Ltd. All further pleadings and other papers shall befiled in, and all further docket entries shall be made in the docket of Nevada Copper,Inc., Case No. 24-50566 hlb and such docket should be consulted for all mattersaffecting these chapter 11 cases. (nac) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 06/13 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Wed 06/12 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)
Tue 06/11 2:00 PM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (dcl) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-11
Tue 06/11 1:59 PM
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 6/25/2024. Deficient Matrix due by 6/17/2024. Verification of Creditor Matrix due by 6/17/2024. List of all creditors due by 6/17/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 6/25/2024. Schedule A/B due by 6/25/2024. Schedule D due by 6/25/2024.Schedule E/F due by 6/25/2024. Schedule G due by 6/25/2024. Schedule H due by 6/25/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 6/25/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 6/25/2024. Declaration Re: E-Filing due by 6/25/2024. (dcl) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (BK)
Tue 06/11 10:33 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 (DAY, JARED) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Mon 06/10 4:30 PM
|
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 06/10 1:24 AM
Motion for Joint Administration 24-50567 24-50568 24-50569 24-50570 24-50571 with Lead Case 24-50566 Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1015(b) and Local Rule of Bankruptcy Practice 1015 with Proposed Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of NC FARMS LLC (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Mon 06/10 12:42 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-50569 ) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A21838057, fee amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Mon 06/10 12:40 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of NC FARMS LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/8/2024. (WORKS, RYAN) |