Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01261 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 3:02 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA, in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/18/2024 3:02 AM MDT |
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
[11097894] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/14/2024. Notice of appearance due on 06/28/2024 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt and on 07/15/2024 for Michael Villecco. 24-1261 | ||
Att: 1 18 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |