Ameliom IT, LLC and Archsys, Inc.
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-51148 |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Ameliom IT, LLC, Ameliom IT, LLC
30985 Oakview Rd
Bulverde, TX 78163-3870 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Fri 08/30 10:57 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
42 | 42
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Fri 08/30 10:56 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June, 2024 (Post-Petition) filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 08/12 3:23 PM
Status Hearing Held: ***STATUS HEARING HELD*** . (Mujica, Roxanne) |
||
Sunday, August 11, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/11 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
order
Use of Cash Collateral (pdf)
Fri 08/09 10:01 AM
FINAL Order Regarding (Order entered on 8/9/2024) (Paez, Daniel) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 08/06 10:42 AM
Hearing Held: ***FINAL ORDER TO COME FROM ANTHONY HERVOL*** . Order due by 8/19/2024 (Mujica, Roxanne) |
||
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/04 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Fri 08/02 3:16 PM
Order Granting (Order entered on 8/2/2024) (Sosa, Alma) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
~Document
Mon 07/29 3:55 PM
Status Report filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC, JointAdmin Debtors Ameliom Ventures, LLC, Archsys, Inc.. (Hervol, H.) |
|
trustee
UST 341 Meeting Held/Not Held
Mon 07/29 7:53 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Proceeding Concluded. ; (Rose, James) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Thu 07/25 4:49 PM
Order Approving (Order entered on 7/25/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Fri 07/26 5:10 PM
Hearing Held: APPROVED (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
~Document
Wed 07/24 10:09 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
34 | 34
misc
~Document
Wed 07/24 3:45 PM
Notice of Order Approving Employment of Attorney filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/18 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
court
Hearing (NO FORM)
Thu 07/18 9:37 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Hearing Scheduled For 7/25/2024 at 09:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ANTHONY HERVOL IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE*** (Elizondo, Lisa) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/17 2:00 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Tue 07/16 2:28 PM
Order Regarding (Order entered on 7/16/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
28 | 28
order
Employ (pdf)
Tue 07/16 7:14 AM
Order Approving (Order entered on 7/16/2024) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Employ (pdf)
Mon 07/15 4:38 PM
Order Mooting (Order entered on 7/15/2024) (Sosa, Alma) |
|
26 | 26
order
Employ (pdf)
Mon 07/15 4:18 PM
Order Mooting (Order entered on 7/15/2024) (Sosa, Alma) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Expedite Hearing
Mon 07/15 12:06 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
8
pgs
motion
Sell Property under Section 363(b)
Mon 07/15 12:00 PM
Expedited Motion to Sell Property under Section 363(b), Debtor's Interest in a 2023 Mercedes CS63S Motor Vehicle , filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
9
pgs
motion
Employ
Sat 07/13 4:42 PM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor, Ameliom Ventures, LLC filed by H. Anthony Hervol for JointAdmin Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
9
pgs
motion
Employ
Sat 07/13 4:39 PM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor, Archsys, Inc., H. Anthony Hervol filed by H. Anthony Hervol for JointAdmin Debtor Archsys, Inc.(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Employ
Sat 07/13 4:17 PM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC, H. Anthony Hervol filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
misc
Master Service List
Sat 07/13 4:06 PM
Master Service List filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC, JointAdmin Debtors Ameliom Ventures, LLC, Archsys, Inc.. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/12 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 07/11 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jamie Kirk for Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division. (Kirk, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
BK-Status Hearing Ch 11 Sub V (F)
Wed 07/10 7:37 AM
Order for SUBCHAPTER_V Status Hearing |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
~Application (Generic)
Tue 07/09 6:35 PM
Unopposed Application of Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Securiy Deposit (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Eric Terry for Trustee Eric Terry(Terry, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
BK-Jointly Administering Cases (pdf)
Tue 07/09 12:46 PM
Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number: 24-51148 (Order entered on 7/9/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
14 | 14
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Tue 07/09 12:39 PM
Interim Order Regarding (Order entered on 7/9/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
court
Hearing Continued (NO FORM)
Tue 07/09 8:04 AM
Hearing FINAL HEARING SET Hearing Scheduled For 8/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***INTERIM ORDER TO COME ANTHONY HERVOL, FINAL HEARING SET IN OPEN COURT ON 7/8/24-NFN*** (Elizondo, Lisa) |
||
court
Event (Public)
Tue 07/09 1:37 PM
Court Public Entry: An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Ameliom IT, LLC, Archsys, Inc., and Ameliom Ventures, LLC; the docket in the chapter 11 case of Ameliom IT, LLC, Case No. 24-51148 CAG, should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/09 8:47 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED - ORDER TO COME FROM ANTHONY HERVOL*** . Order due by 7/22/2024 (Mujica, Roxanne) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/09 8:50 AM
Hearing Held: ***INTERIM ORDER TO COME FROM ANTHONY HERVOL - FINAL HEARING SET FOR 8/5/24 AT 10:00AM*** . Order due by 7/22/2024 (Mujica, Roxanne) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Fri 07/05 9:39 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Schedules, Statements, and Summary
Fri 07/05 9:38 PM
Schedules, Statements, and Summary filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 07/12/2024 (Hervol, H.) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Tue 07/02 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael Paul Menton for Creditor Encore Bank. (Menton, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Hearing
Mon 07/01 11:52 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing (NO FORM)
Fri 06/28 8:37 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Hearing Scheduled For 7/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***ANTHONY HERVOL SHALL GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING*** (Elizondo, Lisa) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/27 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Thu 06/27 2:20 PM
Order Granting (Order entered on 6/27/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Expedite Hearing
Wed 06/26 9:16 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Wed 06/26 4:59 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases
Wed 06/26 4:26 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (F)
Tue 06/25 3:51 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 7/26/2024 at 11:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 9/24/2024- Proofs of Claim Due 8/29/2024 (Sosa, Alma) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
trustee
UST Notice Appointing Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Trustee
Tue 06/25 10:26 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Eric Terry added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: July 26, 2024 @ 11:00 A.M.(Rose, James) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF)
Mon 06/24 6:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST James W Rose Jr (Rose, James) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Thu 06/20 9:26 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom IT, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Thu 06/20 9:22 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Ameliom IT, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/27/2024 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/18/2024. (Hervol, H.) |
|
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Thu 06/20 9:30 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-51148 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A24530634 (U.S. Treasury) |