Ameliom Ventures, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-51148
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-51148
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-51150 |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Ameliom Ventures, LLC, Ameliom Ventures, LLC
30985 Oakview Rd
Bulverde, TX 78163-3870 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Fri 08/30 11:05 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July, 2024 filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Fri 08/30 11:03 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June, 2024 (Post-Petition) filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
trustee
UST 341 Meeting Held/Not Held
Mon 07/29 7:55 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Proceeding Concluded. ; (Rose, James) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
~Document
Wed 07/24 3:52 PM
Notice of Order Approving Employment of Attorney filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/21 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Employ (pdf)
Fri 07/19 3:00 PM
Order Approving (Order entered on 7/19/2024) (Sosa, Alma) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Employ
Thu 07/18 10:57 AM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor, H. Anthony Hervol filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
BK-Jointly Administering Cases (pdf)
Tue 07/09 12:53 PM
Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number: 24-51148 (Order entered on 7/9/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
court
Event (Public)
Tue 07/09 1:41 PM
Court Public Entry: An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Ameliom IT, LLC, Archsys, Inc., and Ameliom Ventures, LLC; the docket in the chapter 11 case of Ameliom IT, LLC, Case No. 24-51148 CAG, should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 07/09 8:57 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED - ORDER TO COME FROM ANTHONY HERVOL*** . Order due by 7/22/2024 (Mujica, Roxanne) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Fri 07/05 9:50 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Schedules, Statements, and Summary
Fri 07/05 9:49 PM
Schedules, Statements, and Summary filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 07/12/2024 (Hervol, H.) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Tue 07/02 1:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael Paul Menton for Creditor Encore Bank. (Menton, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Hearing
Mon 07/01 11:54 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing (NO FORM)
Fri 06/28 8:40 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Hearing Scheduled For 7/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***ANTHONY HERVOL SHALL GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING*** (Elizondo, Lisa) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/27 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
order
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
Thu 06/27 2:23 PM
Order Granting (Order entered on 6/27/2024) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Expedite Hearing
Wed 06/26 9:27 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases
Wed 06/26 4:44 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC(Hervol, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (F)
Tue 06/25 3:54 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Subchapter V of Chapter 11 (F) Set For 7/26/2024 at 11:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)909-2905; Code: 5519921#; Objections to Dischargeability due by 9/24/2024- Proofs of Claim Due 8/29/2024 (Sosa, Alma) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
trustee
UST Notice Appointing Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Trustee
Tue 06/25 8:44 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee, Eric Terry added to the case, 341 meeting to be held: July 26, 2024 @ 11:00 A.M.(Rose, James) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF)
Mon 06/24 6:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST James W Rose Jr (Rose, James) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
BK-Reassigning Case (PDF)
Fri 06/21 12:42 PM
Order Reassigning Business of the Court. Michael M Parker terminated from the case, Judge Craig A Gargotta assigned to case. (Order entered on 6/21/2024) (Hardage, Bridget) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Thu 06/20 11:01 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by H. Anthony Hervol for Debtor Ameliom Ventures, LLC. (Hervol, H.) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Thu 06/20 10:51 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Ameliom Ventures, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/27/2024 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/18/2024. (Hervol, H.) |
|
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Thu 06/20 11:57 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-51150 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt B24530899 (U.S. Treasury) |