In Re Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Robert T Numbers, II |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00352 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Fri 09/06 2:15 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joseph M Lyon on behalf of Dylan Joseph Dragone. (Lyon, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Thu 09/05 10:42 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ronald Podolny on behalf of Emmanuel Chaidez, Dylan Joseph Dragone, Charles McGee, Brian Riley, Don Smith, Gregory Vogel. (Podolny, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 09/04 4:25 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/4/2024. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 09/03 11:45 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding31 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 08/28 9:23 AM
ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 8/27/2024. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/26 7:18 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding31 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Consolidate Cases
Mon 08/26 7:17 PM
Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Mon 08/26 10:38 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jeff Ostrow on behalf of Emmanuel Chaidez. (Ostrow, Jeff) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Fri 08/23 2:50 PM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel . (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Proposed Order
Thu 08/22 5:03 PM
Proposed Order regarding27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Emmanuel Chaidez, Dylan Joseph Dragone, Charles McGee, Brian Riley, Don Smith, Gregory Vogel. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
28 | 28
25
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Thu 08/22 4:57 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Emmanuel Chaidez, Dylan Joseph Dragone, Charles McGee, Brian Riley, Don Smith, Gregory Vogel. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 08/22 4:42 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Emmanuel Chaidez, Dylan Joseph Dragone, Charles McGee, Brian Riley, Don Smith, Gregory Vogel. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Thu 08/22 2:13 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John A. Yanchunis on behalf of Charles McGee, Emmanuel Chaidez, Don Smith, Dylan Joseph Dragone, Gregory Vogel, Brian Riley. (Yanchunis, John) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Mon 08/19 12:59 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Terence Coates on behalf of Don Smith. (Coates, Terence) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 08/14 4:08 PM
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 8/14/2024. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Mon 08/12 10:04 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding22 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Thu 08/08 4:05 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding22 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 08/08 4:04 PM
Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Mon 08/05 11:25 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Charles E. Schaffer on behalf of Raymond S. Moule. (Schaffer, Charles) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Thu 08/01 12:07 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case Numbers 5:24-CV-00426, 5:24-CV -00419, and 5:24-CV-00404 are consolidated with this action, and the Clerk of Court is directed to subsequently close those cases. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed in Case No. 5:24-CV-00352. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers, II on 7/31/2024. (Stouch, L.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Related Case
Wed 07/31 4:43 PM
Notice of Related Case filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation (Third) . (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 07/31 11:43 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Cook, Moule and Levy . (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Proposed Order
Tue 07/30 3:52 PM
Proposed Order regarding16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Cook, Moule and Levy by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
17 | 17
8
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 07/30 3:50 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Cook, Moule and Levy filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 07/30 3:48 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Cook, Moule and Levy filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 07/25 8:14 PM
Notice of Related Case filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Second) . (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Related Case
Wed 07/24 8:52 PM
Notice of Related Case filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. . (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 07/24 9:04 AM
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/23/2024. (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Mon 07/22 9:09 AM
Motion Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Fri 07/19 10:23 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. In accordance with the Practice Preferences of Chief Judge Myers, please also email the proposed order in a word processing format to Documents_Judge_Myers@nced.uscourts.gov. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/17 3:43 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons In A Civil Action filed by Charles McGee served on Advance Auto Parts, Inc on 7/9/24. (Harris, Scott) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/17 1:59 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 1:55 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Hamilton Segars on behalf of Advance Auto Parts, Inc.. (Segars, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
12
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 07/16 4:18 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Charles McGee. (Harris, Scott) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 07/16 4:16 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Charles McGee. (Harris, Scott) Modified on 7/16/2024 to correct the naming of attachment 1.(Cannon, S) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Tue 07/16 1:42 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Bryan L. Bleichner on behalf of Charles McGee. (Bleichner, Bryan) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Selected for Mediation
Mon 07/01 1:17 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 06/27 11:44 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Charles McGee. Amendment to4 Financial Disclosure Statement (Harris, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/27 11:07 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Charles McGee (Harris, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/27 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Thu 06/27 8:56 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Charles McGee. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/24 12:46 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Scott C. Harris on behalf of Charles McGee. (Harris, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Advance Auto Parts, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7662271.), filed by Charles McGee. (Harris, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |