Cook v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Consolidated
Lead case: 5:24-cv-00352
Lead case: 5:24-cv-00352
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Kimberly A Swank |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00426 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 6:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Aaron Cook
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 08/14 4:36 PM
Case association created with 5:24-cv-00352-M-RN. (McNally, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 08/01 12:11 PM
Remark - Case closed pursuant to order entered in 5:24-cv-352-M on 8/1/2024. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papersshall be filed in Case No. 5:24-CV-00352. (Stouch, L.) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/31 1:22 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated waiver sent on 7/31/2024, answer due 9/29/2024. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/29 4:30 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:24-CV-426-M-KS. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/29/2024. (Hockaday, A.) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/26 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Hamilton Segars on behalf of Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Segars, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 11:22 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/26 11:21 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (Dagger, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ruth Sheehan on behalf of Caleb Aaron Cook. (Sheehan, Ruth) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 2:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice-other
Thu 07/25 9:37 AM
Notice filed by caleb aaron cook Summons . (Rhine, Joel) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice-other
Thu 07/25 9:36 AM
Notice filed by caleb aaron cook Civil Cover Sheet . (Rhine, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 8:54 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of caleb aaron cook. (Rhine, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice-other
Thu 07/25 8:54 AM
Notice filed by caleb aaron cook Financial Disclosure Statement . (Rhine, Joel) |
|
notice
Notice to Counsel
Thu 07/25 2:04 PM
Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Data Breach Litigation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7703259.), filed by caleb aaron cook. (Sheehan, Ruth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Notice Letter to Cook |