TITAN SOLAR POWER FL, INC.
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Madeleine C Wanslee |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-05226 |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Debtor
TITAN SOLAR POWER FL, INC.
901 Armstrong Blvd
Kissimmee, FL 34741-4618 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
Docket last updated: 06/28/2024 12:07 PM MST |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment
Fri 06/28 10:14 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-05226] ) [other,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36652562. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 07/19/2024, Master Mailing due 07/5/2024, Schedules A/B-J due 07/12/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/12/2024, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 07/12/2024, filed by CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY of Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. on behalf of TITAN SOLAR POWER FL, INC. (BAYLEY, CHRISTOPHER) |