Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-05226

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Madeleine C Wanslee
Case #: 2:24-ap-00242
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
TITAN SOLAR POWER, FL, INC
Represented By
TITAN SOLAR POWER, FL, INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Carter
Represented By
Bryant H Dunivan, Jr
The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Howard
Represented By
Bryant H Dunivan, Jr
The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Altomare
Represented By
Bryant H Dunivan, Jr
The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Lyvers
Represented By
Bryant H Dunivan, Jr
The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MST
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Wed 02/19 1:28 PM
Notice of Filing filed by Bryant H Dunivan Jr of The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA on behalf of Patricia Altomare, Robert Carter, Jennifer Howard, Karen Lyvers.(Dunivan, Bryant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Tue 12/03 8:24 AM
Summons Issued . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/02 8:51 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Bryant H Dunivan Jr of The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA on behalf of Patricia Altomare, Robert Carter, Jennifer Howard, Karen Lyvers. (Dunivan, Bryant)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 9:09 AM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00242. Complaint (350.00 fee) against TITAN SOLAR POWER, FL, INC filed by Bryant H Dunivan Jr of The Consumer Protection Attorney, PA on behalf of Robert Carter, Jennifer Howard, Patricia Altomare, Karen Lyvers Nature of Suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) 14 Related [+] 72 (Injunctive relief - other) 91 (Declaratory judgment) . (Dunivan, Bryant)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other