RKO Services, LLC and Vernon Southerland
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20186 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
RKO Services, LLC
14602 Villa Maria Isabel
Corpus Christi, TX 78418-7507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
615 E. Houston Street Suite 533
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
84 | 84
1
pgs
audio
MP3
Fri 09/13 3:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/13/2024 10:57:58 AM ]. File Size [ 6992 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:34 ]. (admin) |
|
83 | 83
court
Courtroom Minutes
Fri 09/13 11:47 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:57 AM - 11:13 AM. Appearances: Ross Travis for the US Trustee. Gray Burks for the Debtor. Jessica Hanzlik for the Trustee. Drew McManigle for the US Trustee. Motion16 denied for reasons stated on the record. As stated on the record, hearing on ECF no. 66 in case no. 24-33112 continued to 9/20/2024 at 9:00 AM. (acj4) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
82 | 82
2
pgs
misc
Exhibit List
Thu 09/12 7:00 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By RKO Services, LLC ) (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 5 - Amended Disclosure of Compensation | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 16 - Unsworn Declaration of Sandra Reinecke | ||
81 | 81
1
pgs
misc
Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules
Thu 09/12 3:37 PM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules (Filed By RKO Services, LLC ). (fmc2) |
|
80 | 80
16
pgs
notice
Notice
Thu 09/12 3:18 PM
Notice of Issuance of Subpoena . Filed by Michel Gloor Properties LLC (Judd, T.) |
|
79 | 79
3
pgs
misc
Exhibit List
Thu 09/12 11:48 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By RKO Services, LLC ) (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 10 8 pgs Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held
Tue 09/10 3:42 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Hearing Concluded (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
2
pgs
notice
Notice
Mon 09/09 2:04 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by RKO Services, LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
77 | 77
2
pgs
notice
Notice
Mon 09/09 2:02 PM
Notice of Status Conference . Filed by RKO Services, LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Fri 09/06 9:20 AM
Evidentiary Hearing Set Hearing scheduled for 9/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
court
Hearing Set
Fri 09/06 10:20 AM
Hearing Set by the Court Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Status conference to be held on 9/13/2024 at 11:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (SierraThomasAnderson) Modified on 9/6/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
court
Hearing Set
Fri 09/06 10:28 AM
Evidentiary Hearing Set Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing scheduled for 9/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (SierraThomasAnderson) |