Holiday in Cam LLC Jointly Administered under 24-20186.
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-20186
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-20186
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20188 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Holiday in Cam LLC
14602 Villa Maria Isabel
Corpus Christi, TX 78418-7507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
615 E. Houston Street Suite 533
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules
Fri 09/13 10:38 AM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (fmc2) |
|
46 | 46
1
pgs
misc
Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules
Thu 09/12 4:57 PM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (fmc2) |
|
45 | 45
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Travis Clayton Badger Filed by on behalf of Quest Trust Company FBO Robert F. Rundle IRA #32014-11 (Badger, Travis) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held
Tue 09/10 3:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Hearing Concluded (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
4
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/05 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.) |
|
43 | 43
3
pgs
notice
Notice
Thu 09/05 10:20 AM
Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors . Filed by Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Tue 09/03 7:27 PM
Amended Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order to Employ
Tue 09/03 4:47 PM
Order Approving Application to Employ Signed on 9/3/2024. (acj4) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 08/28 7:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Toni Lanette Townsend Filed by on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for Ibis Holdings A Trust (Townsend, Toni) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held
Fri 08/23 2:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Hearing Not Concluded adjourned to September 10, 2024 at 2:00pm via teleconference (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
13
pgs
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Thu 08/22 5:26 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Wed 08/21 8:05 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 7/31/2024, $0 disbursed (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Wed 08/21 7:45 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
36 | 36
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Wed 08/21 7:45 PM
Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: , Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders , Declaration re: (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice
Wed 08/21 7:43 PM
Notice - Official Form 426 . Filed by Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Cash Collateral (Use)
Thu 08/15 11:16 AM
Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice
Wed 08/14 6:23 PM
Notice of Emergency Hearing on Friday, August 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. . Filed by Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice
Wed 08/14 12:15 PM
Notice of Emergency Hearing . Filed by Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Emergency Motion
Tue 08/13 1:58 PM
Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Rents Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
court
Entry
Mon 08/12 10:21 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the cases of RKO Services, LLC, et al. The docket in Case No. 24-20186 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate
Mon 08/05 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ) (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/04 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 08/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Fri 08/02 2:27 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order for Joint Administration
Fri 08/02 8:52 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Cases Signed on 8/2/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held
Fri 08/02 2:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor Appeared. Hearing Not Concluded adjourned to August 23, 2024 at 1:00pm via teleconference (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 08/01 8:29 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 08/01 2:55 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/31 7:06 PM
Declaration re: Non-Individual Debtor's Schedules (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ) (Burks, H.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 07/29 9:08 AM
Application to Employ Planisphere LLC and Robert Perugini as Property Managers. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
41
pgs
misc
Schedule A/B
Fri 07/26 11:44 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
20 | 20
4
pgs
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 07/26 8:43 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
court
Document
Thu 07/25 2:54 PM
Letter by Mark Trout (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
court
Hearing Set
Thu 07/25 2:56 PM
Hearing Set Status conference to be held on 8/14/2024 at 01:30 PM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Tue 07/23 3:12 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors? No. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case? Yes. (acj4) |
|
17 | 17
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Tue 07/23 3:05 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors? No. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case? Yes. (acj4) |
|
16 | 16
4
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 07/22 3:34 PM
Application to Employ H. Gray Burks, IV as Attorney. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/18 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 07/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
misc
Statement
Wed 07/17 9:22 AM
Statement - Corporate Ownership Statement (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 07/16 11:40 AM
Order Granting Extension of Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Other Documents Signed on 7/16/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
utility
Update Other Deadlines
Tue 07/16 11:42 AM
Deadlines Updated Incomplete Filings (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Mon 07/15 6:06 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Holiday in Cam LLC (Burks, H.) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Index | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/12 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
misc
Equity Security Holders
Fri 07/12 6:40 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
misc
Amended Petition (Attorney Use)
Fri 07/12 6:40 PM
Amended Petition (Filed By Holiday in Cam LLC ). (Burks, H.) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/12 1:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan R. Fuertes Filed by on behalf of Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division (Fuertes, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/10 12:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Diane Wade Sanders Filed by on behalf of Nueces County (Sanders, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING)
Tue 07/09 8:51 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/2/2024 at 11:00 AM, US Trustee Corpus Christi Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 10/1/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 9/9/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/28/2024. (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
trustee
Ch 11 Subch V Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 07/08 4:04 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Drew McManigle added to case as trustee. (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee | ||
Thursday, July 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/04 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/03 9:10 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20188 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25403746. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Anthony Battaglia Filed by on behalf of Jet Lending, LLC (Battaglia, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Setting Hearing
Tue 07/02 1:33 PM
Initial Order in Subchapter V Case, Signed on 7/2/2024 Status conference to be held on 8/14/2024 at 01:30 PM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. (tjl4) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/02 10:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jessica L Hanzlik (Hanzlik, Jessica) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 07/01 7:50 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Holiday in Cam LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 09/30/2024. (Burks, H.) |