JW's at the Mallard LLC, et al
Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Phyllis M Jones |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-12156 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
JW's at the Mallard LLC
3006 S Caraway Rd
Jonesboro, AR 72401-7308 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 12:00 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/23 6:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
48 | 48
court
Hearing Held
Thu 08/22 3:07 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE CONCLUDED 8.22.24 WITH CONSOLIDATED CASE 3:24-bk-12191 Higher Heights Learning Academy. (Johnson, Y) Modified on 8/23/2024 (Johnson, Y) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Authority
Tue 08/20 2:01 PM
Order Approving Motion For Authority to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Entered on Docket 8/20/2024 (Acred, Hannah) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/14 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
45 | 45
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Wed 08/14 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report (Ch 11)
Tue 08/13 2:17 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Mon 08/12 1:16 PM
Status Conference Hearing CONTINUED (OUT OF DIVISION) - PARTIES REQUESTED & AGREED PER EMAIL FROM WILLIAM GODBOLD. Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2024 at 01:30 PM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Employ
Mon 08/12 12:46 PM
Order Approving Application to Employ Atttorney for Debtor Entered on Docket 8/12/2024 (Acred, Hannah) |
|
Saturday, August 10, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Sat 08/10 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Thu 08/08 3:06 PM
Evidentiary Hearing CONTINUED (OUT OF DIVISION) PARTIES REQUESTED & AGREED. Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2024 at 01:30 PM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)
Wed 08/07 8:41 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ralph W. Waddell Creditor AS-Sami, LLC (Waddell, Ralph) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
trustee
Amended Meeting of Creditors Minutes (UST)
Thu 08/01 1:55 PM
Amended Meeting of Creditors Minutes Meeting of Creditors was Held and Concluded for Jointly Administered Cases of JW's at the Mallard, LLC (3:24-bk-12156) and Higher Heights Learning Academy (3:24-bk-12191) filed by U.S. Trustee Filed by Trustee (Mansfield, MaryBeth) |
|
37 | 37
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held (UST)
Thu 08/01 1:18 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Mansfield, MaryBeth) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Wed 07/31 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched
Mon 07/29 10:21 AM
Evidentiary Hearing SCHEDULED (OUT OF DIVISION) Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2024 at 09:30 AM at Phyllis Jones' Little Rock Courtroom. (Johnson, Y) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Sat 07/27 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/27 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Thu 07/25 10:27 AM
Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Proofs of Claims due by 9/24/2024. Entered on 7/25/2024(Acred, Hannah) |
|
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Status Conference
Thu 07/25 10:26 AM
Order Setting Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Phyllis Jones' Jonesboro Courtroom. Pre-Status Report Due By 7/31/2024. Entered on 7/25/2024(Acred, Hannah) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)
Mon 07/22 6:47 PM
Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Sch A/B, Sch G, Sch H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor, Stmt of Financial Affairs, [Fee Due No] Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Small Business Income Tax Return
Mon 07/22 6:45 PM
Small Business Income Tax Return for the Year for 2023 Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Corporate Resolution
Mon 07/22 6:44 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)
Thu 07/18 2:54 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Sch A/B, Sch G, Sch H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor, Stmt of Financial Affairs, [Fee Due No] Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Resolution
Thu 07/18 2:53 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Wed 07/17 4:10 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Schedules-Documents due 7/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/22/2024. Corporate Resolution due 7/22/2024. Entered on Docket 7/17/2024 (McDaniel, Lisa) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Order (UST)
Wed 07/17 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion For Issuance of Order Entered on Docket 7/17/2024 (McDaniel, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Issuance of Order (UST)
Tue 07/16 4:49 PM
Motion for Issuance of Order Motion to Approve Stipulated Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case filed by U.S. Trustee (Johnson, Kent) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation (UST)
Tue 07/16 4:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between United States Trustee and Debtor-in-Possession regarding Scheduling Order in a Small Business Chapter 11 Case filed by U.S. Trustee (Johnson, Kent) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Mon 07/15 6:53 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/13 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
Public Docket Remark (Chambers ONLY)
Thu 07/11 12:58 PM
Docket Remark: An order has been entered in this case directing theprocedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter11 cases of JWs at the Mallard, LLC and Higher Heights LearningAcademy. The docket in the chapter 11 case of JWs at the Mallard,LLC should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Acred, Hannah) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 07/11 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Entered on 7/11/2024(Acred, Hannah) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 07/10 1:01 PM
Notice of Change of Creditor Address (Godbold, William) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Employ (Motion)
Wed 07/10 9:19 AM
Amended Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Mon 07/08 6:17 PM
Small Business Cash Flow Statement , Small Business Balance Sheet, Small Business Statement of Operations Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Thursday, July 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 07/04 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/03 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Joint Administration (Motion)
Wed 07/03 1:08 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Ch 11)
Wed 07/03 9:19 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Corrected Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of Debtor JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
motion
Employ (Motion)
Wed 07/03 7:45 AM
Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by William F Godbold IV on behalf of JW's at the Mallard LLC (Godbold, William) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)
Tue 07/02 3:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2024 at 09:30 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 9/30/2024. (Johnson, Kent) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Authority
Tue 07/02 1:54 PM
Motion for Authority to Escrow Funds for Advance Fees and Expenses for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee and Notice of Opportunity to Object Filed by Beverly I Brister on behalf of Beverly I Brister (Brister, Beverly) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Opportunity to Object | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
notice
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 07/02 12:55 PM
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee(Mansfield, MaryBeth) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee, Beverly I. Brister | ||
4 | 4
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)
Tue 07/02 12:44 PM
***DELETED NOTICE FROM BNC PER UST. UST WILL DOCKET A NEW NOTICE.*** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2024 at 09:30 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 9/30/2024. (Johnson, Kent) Modified on 7/2/2024 (McCormack, Linda) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Order of Deficiency
Mon 07/01 4:30 PM
Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/15/2024. Schedules-Documents due 7/15/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/15/2024. Corporate Resolution due 7/15/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due 7/8/2024Small Business Balance Sheet due: 7/8/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 7/8/2024 (Acred, Hannah) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Receipt (Auto)
Mon 07/01 2:53 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:24-bk-12156] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A16226488, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 07/01 2:52 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by JW's at the Mallard LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 09/30/2024. (Godbold, William) |