SMITH v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03048 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO HOLDINGS A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO VENTURES US, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JOHNNY SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO HOLDINGS A/S, NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC., NOVO VENTURES US, INC.. (amas) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Mon 07/15 8:03 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case. EDPA. Case number in EDPA: 24-3048 (nd) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/12 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO HOLDINGS A/S, NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC., NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC., NOVO VENTURES US, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17598384.), filed by JOHNNY SMITH.(Schramm, Sara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form |