GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS (GLP-1 RAS) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-md-03094 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 11:45 AM EDT |
IN RE:
GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS (GLP-1 RAS) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Notice Only Party
PLAINTIFF(S)
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
Nordisk North America Operations A/S
|
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO VENTURES US, INC.
|
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO HOLDINGS EQUITY US INC.
|
|
Notice Only Party
NOVO HOLDINGS A/S
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
Emisphere Technologies
|
|
Notice Only Party
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
251 | 251
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 09/13 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Zoom Telephone Conference held on 9/13/24. Court Reporter: Lynn Gligor. (mbh) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
250 | 250
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 09/12 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT Karen Stacey against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17738347.), filed by PLAINTIFF(S).(BINSTOCK EPHRON, MELISSA) ***FILED IN ERROR; TO BE RE-FILED AS A NEW CASE 24-4863 ** Modified on 9/13/2024 (nd). |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
249 | 249
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/09 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Loren M King, IV on behalf of PLAINTIFF(S)(King, Loren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
248 | 248
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/09 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Spencer on behalf of PLAINTIFF(S)(Spencer, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
247 | 247
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 09/09 12:05 PM
ORDER THAT THE IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 16, 2024 AT 2:00 P.M. (SEE DOC. NO. 206) IS RESCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2024 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 16B. COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO MEET AND CONFER IN ANTICIPATION OF THE CONFERENCE. ANY COUNSEL MAY INDIVIDUALLY OR ON SOME JOINT BASIS SUBMIT SUGGESTIONS FOR THE AGENDA NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 16, 2024. THE COURT WILL CIRCULATE THE FINAL AGENDA NO LATER THAN THREE DAYS BEFORE THE CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/9/24. 9/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL.(APPLIES TO ALL ACTIONS)(amas) |
|
246 | 246
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 09/09 11:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Telephone Conference held on 9/9/24 Court Reporter: LYNN GLIGOR. (amas) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
245 | 245
motion
Reconsideration Permit
Fri 09/06 3:07 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re235 Order,, Precluding Marketing Discovery and , MOTION to Permit Marketing Discovery filed by PLAINTIFF(S).Memorandum.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order |