STEPAN v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03072 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
WANDA JO STEPAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 7/16/24 (va) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 12:06 PM
NOTICE by WANDA JO STEPAN DESIGNATION FORM (AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) |
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 07/16 9:32 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. 's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt) |
||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/16 10:06 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3072. (sbt) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/15 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17601630.), filed by WANDA JO STEPAN.(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |