BOGLE v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03093 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
100 COLLEGE ROAD WEST
PRINCETON, NJ 08540 |
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Plaintiff
CANDELARIA BOGLE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 12:56 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/17/2024 (sg) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 8:59 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3093. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
50
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17604660.), filed by CANDELARIA BOGLE.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |