BRIDGES v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03098 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
COURTNEY BRIDGES
506 Magnolia St.
Cuba, MO 65453 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (amas) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 9:07 AM
MDL- (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3098. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
35
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17604746.), filed by COURTNEY BRIDGES.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |