MITCHELL v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03101 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
ERICA MITCHELL
418 W 36th st.
Wilmington, DE 19802 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 7:26 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/17 10:16 AM
NOTICE by ERICA MITCHELL Corrected Designation Form (PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 9:36 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3101. (sbt) |
||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Wed 07/17 9:43 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Certification question asking if the case is related needs to be answered. A signature is also required. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
39
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17604810.), filed by ERICA MITCHELL.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |