STARRATT v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03114 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
TARA STARRATT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 7:36 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/18/24 (bw) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
51
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/17 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT of TARA STARRATT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17606634.), filed by TARA STARRATT.(AUTRY, JOSHUA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 1:17 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3114. (sbt) |