288
|
|
288
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 09/13 2:39 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to Employ Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date; (II) Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2; (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 280) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
287
|
|
287
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 09/13 2:38 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order Granting Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 273), Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Hilco Corporate Finance, LLC as Investment Banker for the Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a) and 328(a), Effective as of the Petition Date, (II) Waiving Certain Information Requirements Imposed by Local Rule 2016-2, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 274), Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of CR3 Partners, LLC as Financial Advisor for the Debtors as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 275), Order Granting Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Keen-Summit Capital Partners LLC as Real Estate Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 276),Order Granting Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Raines Feldman Littrell LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 277), and Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Professionals (Docket No. 278) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
286
|
|
286
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 09/13 2:35 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date (Docket No. 272) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
285
|
|
285
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:36 PM
Objection to Stalking Horse Notice (Corrected from version filed at D.I. 279 solely to reflect the correct case number listed in the case caption) Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee (Lipshie, Jonathan)
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
284
|
|
284
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 3:32 PM
Limited Objection of RAR2 - Marina Marketplace CA, LLC, Street Retail, LLC and The Macerich Company to (1) Debtors' Motion for Entry of Orders: (I) (A) Approving Bidding Procedures and Protections in Connection With a Sale of Substantially All of Debtors Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests; (B) Authorizing the Debtors to Designate a Stalking Horse Bid; (C) Scheduling an Auction and Sale Hearing; (D) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof; and (E) Approving Procedures Related to Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Leases; (II) (A) Authorizing Sale of Substantially All of Debtors Assets Pursuant to Successful Bidder(s) Asset Purchase Agreement(s), Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Other Interests; and (B) Approving Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Leases; and (III) Granting Related Relief and (2) that certain Notice to Contract Parties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Related [+] Filed by Macerich Company, RAR2 - Marina Marketplace CA, LLC, Street Retail, LLC (Heilman, Leslie)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1 - 2
|
| |
Att: 2
Certificate of Service
|
283
|
|
283
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 12:49 PM
Objection Of Westfield, LLC, UTC Venture LLC, And Century City Mall, LLC To Notice To Contract Parties To Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Related [+] Filed by Century City Mall, LLC, UTC Venture LLC, Westfield, LLC (Kaufman, Susan)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
Certificate of Service
|
282
|
|
282
answer
Response
Thu 09/12 12:40 PM
Response of 523 West 6th Street Property Owner LLC and VRZ Arrezo Apartments LLC to Debtors' Notice to Contract Parties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Related [+] Filed by 523 West 6th Street Property Owner LLC, VRS Arrezo Apartments, LLC (Roglen, Laurel)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2
|
| |
Att: 3
Certificate of Service
|
281
|
|
281
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 10:28 AM
Objection to Debtors Notice to Contract Parties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; Reservation of Rights Related [+] Filed by Sunset Vine Tower, Inc. (Bifferato, Karen)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Certificate of Service
|
280
|
|
280
order
Employ (Application)
Thu 09/12 10:16 AM
Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to Employ Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business, Nunc Pro Tunc to The Petition Date; (II) Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2; (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 9/12/2024. (CB)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2
|
279
|
|
279
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 9:54 AM
Objection to Stalking Horse Notice Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee (Lipshie, Jonathan)
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Service
|
278
|
|
278
5
pgs
order
Order Approving Motion Regarding Interim Compensation Procedures
Wed 09/11 5:32 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Professionals Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
277
|
|
277
order
Employ (Application)
Wed 09/11 5:21 PM
Order Granting Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Raines Feldman Littrell LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
276
|
|
276
order
Employ (Application)
Wed 09/11 5:14 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Keen-Summit Capital Partners LLC as Real Estate Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
275
|
|
275
order
Employ (Application)
Wed 09/11 4:52 PM
Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of CR3 Partners, LLC as Financial Advisor for the Debtors as of the Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
274
|
|
274
order
Employ (Application)
Wed 09/11 4:43 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Hilco Corporate Finance, LLC as Investment Banker for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date, (II) Waiving Certain Information Requirements Imposed by Local Rule 2016-2, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
273
|
|
273
order
Employ (Application)
Wed 09/11 4:30 PM
Order Granting Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2024. (Mml)
|
272
|
|
272
court
Omnibus Hearing Dates
Tue 09/10 4:37 PM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. Related [+] Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 10:30 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 9/10/2024. (CB)
|
271
|
|
271
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 09/10 3:59 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Motion of the Debtors to Establish Deadlines for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof (Docket No. 265) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
270
|
|
270
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 09/10 3:57 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Adequate Assurances of Future Performance, BCOF II Feeder, BCOF II GP Feeder, BCOF II Operating, BCOF II Subred, and Breakwater Private Equity Presentation . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
|
269
|
|
269
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 09/10 3:53 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Amendment to Stalking Horse Notice (Docket No. 252) and Declaration of Richard Klein in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of Orders: (I) (A) Approving Bidding Procedures in Connection With a Sale of Substantially All of Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests; (B) Authorizing the Debtors to Designate a Stalking Horse Bid; (C) Scheduling an Auction and Sale Hearing; (D) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof; and (E) Approving Procedures Related to Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Leases; (II) (A) Authorizing Sale of Substantially All of Debtors' Assets Pursuant to Successful Bidder(s)' Asset Purchase Agreement(s), Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Other Interests; and (B) Approving Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Leases; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 253) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
268
|
|
268
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Tue 09/10 3:48 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Sunset Vine Tower, Inc.. (Blackler, Mia)
Related: [-]
|
267
|
|
267
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 09/10 2:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Form of Order
|
266
|
|
266
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 09/10 1:39 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental): re Notice Telephonic Section 341 Meeting (Docket No. 66), Notice of Commencement (Docket No. 79), and Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 22, 2024 at 11:30 A.M. (Est) (Docket No. 169) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
|
265
|
|
265
motion
Motion to Establish Deadline to File Proofs of Claim
Mon 09/09 9:00 PM
Motion to Establish Deadline to File Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof . Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/24/2024. (Francella, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A: Proposed Order
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A: Proof of Claim Form
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A: Bar Date Notice
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A: Publication Notice
|
| |
Att: 5
Notice of Hearing
|
264
|
|
264
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Mon 09/09 3:56 PM
Certificate of No Objection REGARDING DEBTORS MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING PROEDURES FOR INTERIM COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF PROFESSIONALS Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
263
|
|
263
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:46 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING DEBTORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING DEBTORS TO EMPLOY PROFESSIONALS UTILIZED IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS NUNC PRO TUNC TO THE PETITION DATE; (II) WAIVING CERTAIN INFORMATION REQUIREMENTS OF LOCAL RULE 2016-2; (III) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
262
|
|
262
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:40 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING DEBTORS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION AND EMPLOYMENT OF RAINES FELDMAN LITTRELL LLP AS BANKRUPTCY COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS EFFECTIVE AS OF THE PETITION DATE Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
261
|
|
261
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:30 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING DEBTORS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION AND EMPLOYMENT OF KEEN-SUMMIT CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC AS REAL ESTATE ADVISOR EFFECTIVE AS OF THE PETITION DATE Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
260
|
|
260
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:22 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING APPLICATION TO RETAIN CR3 PARTNERS, LLC AS FINANCIAL ADVISOR FOR THE DEBTORS AS OF THE PETITION DATE Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
259
|
|
259
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:15 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING DEBTORS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION AND EMPLOYMENT OF HILCO CORPORATE FINANCE, LLC AS INVESTMENT BANKER FOR THE DEBTORS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a) AND 328 (a), EFFECTIVE AS OF THE PETITION DATE, (II) WAIVING CERTAIN INFORMATION REQUIREMENTS IMPOSED BY LOCAL RULE 2016-2, AND (III) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
258
|
|
258
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 09/09 3:07 PM
Certification of Counsel REGARDING DEBTORS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION AND EMPLOYMENT OF SHULMAN BASTIAN FRIEDMAN & BUI LLP AS BANKRUPTCY COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS EFFECTIVE AS OF THE PETITION DATE Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B
|
257
|
|
257
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 09/06 8:13 PM
Notice of Service of Filing of Proposed Form of Sale Order Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Form of Order
|
256
|
|
256
misc
Withdrawal - Notice
Fri 09/06 8:08 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Filing of Proposed Form of Sale Order Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
255
|
|
255
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 09/06 6:10 PM
Notice of Service of Filing of Proposed Form of Sale Order Related [+] Filed by One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC. (Francella, Thomas)
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Form of Order
|