Tocaya Toluca, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11553
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11553
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11562 |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tocaya Toluca, LLC, Debtor
1201 W 5th St Ste T400
Los Angeles, CA 90017-2090 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/06 5:44 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, ,. Filed by Tocaya Toluca, LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Exhibit
Fri 07/19 9:59 AM
Exhibit(s) Resolution [Re-Filed to Attach Correct PDF] Filed by Tocaya Toluca, LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order-Joint Admin
Fri 07/19 8:54 AM
Order Approving Joint Administration of Debtors Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of 24-11553 (KBO). The docket in Case No. 24-11553 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related Docket No.3 Signed on 7/19/2024 (CB) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Exhibit
Thu 07/18 3:26 PM
Exhibit(s) Resolution Filed by Tocaya Toluca, LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit
Thu 07/18 3:25 PM
Exhibit(s) Resolution Filed by Tocaya Toluca, LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Thu 07/18 12:10 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by BLT Steak LA LLC, One Table Restaurant Brands, LLC, One Table Restaurant Operations, LLC, Tender Greens OpCo, LLC, Tocaya Holdings LLC, Tocaya Management, LLC, Tocaya Organica, LLC, Tocaya Santa Monica LLC, Tocaya South Bay, LLC, Tocaya Toluca, LLC, Tocaya Venice LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 07/18 8:12 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (BJM) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/17 11:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11562 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11695502, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 07/17 11:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Tocaya Toluca, LLC. (Francella, Thomas) |