GRIFFIN v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03171 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
100 COLLEGE ROAD WEST
PRINCETON, NJ 08540 |
|
Plaintiff
KARMALAH HUTSON GRIFFIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 12:51 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 8:51 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3171. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 07/18 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17611672.), filed by KARMALAH HUTSON GRIFFIN.(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |