SMITH v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03179 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
MARIAH SMITH
911 Binns Blvd.
Columbus, OH 43204 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/19/2024 (sg) |
|
1 | 1
62
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/19 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17612625.), filed by MARIAH SMITH.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 11:24 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3179. (sbt) |