HERBST v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03184 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
TONI HERBST
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/03 10:46 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/3/24 (bw) |
|
3 | 3
60
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/03 10:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, filed by TONI HERBST.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/19/24 (bw) |
|
1 | 1
60
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/19 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT of TONI HERBST against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17613275.), filed by TONI HERBST.(AUTRY, JOSHUA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 1:55 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3184. (sbt) |