LEE v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03186 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER LEE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (amas) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/19 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT of JENNIFER LEE against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17613371.), filed by JENNIFER LEE.(AUTRY, JOSHUA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 2:15 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3186. (sbt) |