A1 Transport Network, Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-17287 |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 30, 2024 |
Debtor
A1 Transport Network, Inc.
6049 SW 128th Ct
Miami, FL 33183-5457 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Examination
Wed 09/04 3:55 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Freight Factoring Specialists, LLC on September 20, 2024 at 10:00a.m. (Document Production Only) Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Subpoena | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/29 12:53 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC . (Zwiebel, Eric) |
|
37 | 37
order
Adequate Protection Order
Thu 08/29 12:07 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay to Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Saturday, August 24, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Sat 08/24 7:15 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Chapter 11 Small Business and/or SUBV Monthly Operating Report
Sat 08/24 6:10 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning 7/20/2024 and Ending 7/31/2024 Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS]
Wed 08/21 1:39 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Schneiderman, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Supplement
Tue 08/20 4:45 PM
Supplement Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
answer
Response
Mon 08/19 4:11 PM
Response to (27 Emergency Motion For Turnover Of Property (Property of the Estate Held by Freight Factoring Services, LLC) filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc.) Filed by Creditor Freight Factoring Specialists LLC (Somodevilla, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/16 5:31 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/16 5:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Fri 08/16 2:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Lance Bergmann Melamud Filed by Creditor FDG Flagler Station Phase 1 LLC. (Melamud, Lance) |
|
28 | 28
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Fri 08/16 8:03 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 08/21/2024 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Turnover of Property
Thu 08/15 7:46 PM
Emergency Motion For Turnover Of Property (Property of the Estate Held by Freight Factoring Services, LLC) Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc., Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
26 | 26
order
Employ Order
Thu 08/15 10:25 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Jeffrey N. Schatzman and the law firm of Schatzman & Schatzman, P.A. as Attorney for the Debtor in Possession (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing
Wed 08/14 1:55 PM
Order Setting Preliminary Hearing and Response Deadline Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2024 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Adequate Protection
Mon 08/12 9:17 AM
Verified Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $199], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Zwiebel, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - C | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit D - F | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 08/12 9:21 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-17287 RAM] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44661735. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Wed 07/31 11:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Zach B Shelomith Filed by Creditor Freight Factoring Specialists LLC. (Shelomith, Zach) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Tue 07/30 8:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Eric B Zwiebel Esq Filed by Creditor Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC. (Zwiebel, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 07/29 5:34 PM
Notice of Filing Documents Pursuant to 11 USC § 1116 , Filed by Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 2 P & L | ||
Att: 3 Cash Flow Projections | ||
Att: 4 Tax Return | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 07/29 5:28 PM
Notice of Filing Documents Pursuant to 11 USC § 1116 , Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 2 P & L | ||
Att: 3 Cash Flow Projections | ||
Att: 4 Tax Return | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/26 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Case Management Summary
Wed 07/24 7:51 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Interested Party AB Brothers USA Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Summary
Wed 07/24 7:51 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/24 10:03 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/24 10:03 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
Tue 07/23 6:52 AM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 09/05/2024 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Joint Administration Order
Tue 07/23 6:26 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-17287 RAM with Member Case 24-17288 RAM (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Mon 07/22 4:18 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/21/2024 at 12:00 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-774-1822 passcode 4573853. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/21/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/30/2024. (Gonzalez, Maria) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 07/22 2:48 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 24-12788 into Lead Case A1 Transport Network, Inc. Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 07/22 2:39 PM
Application to Employ Jeffrey N. Schatzman and the law firm of Schatzman & Schatzman, P.A. as Attorney for the Debtor in Possession [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
notice
UST Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 07/22 1:47 PM
Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Schneiderman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Verified Statement | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business
Mon 07/22 1:24 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 07/22 1:23 PM
Notice of Deadline to Correct Filing Deficiencies Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 7/29/2024].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 7/29/2024. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Saturday, July 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Sat 07/20 8:15 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor A1 Transport Network, Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Sat 07/20 8:02 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Jeffrey N Schatzman. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
28
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Sat 07/20 8:01 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 09/30/2024. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Sat 07/20 8:09 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-17287 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44545497. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |