AB Brothers USA Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-17287
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-17287
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-17288 |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 30, 2024 |
Debtor
AB Brothers USA Inc.
6049 SW 128th Ct
Miami, FL 33183-5457 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS]
Wed 08/21 1:39 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Schneiderman, Steven) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/16 5:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Employ Order
Thu 08/15 10:27 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Jeffrey N. Schatzman and the law firm of Schatzman & Schatzman, P.A. as Attorney for the Debtor in Possession (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/26 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/24 10:06 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/24 10:05 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc. . (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
Tue 07/23 6:54 AM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 09/05/2024 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
10 | 10
order
Joint Administration Order
Tue 07/23 6:36 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-17287 RAM with Member Case 24-17288 RAM (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Mon 07/22 4:14 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/21/2024 at 12:00 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-774-1822 passcode 4573853. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/21/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/30/2024. (Gonzalez, Maria) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 07/22 3:03 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 24-17288 into Lead Case A1 Transport Network, Inc. Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 07/22 2:43 PM
Application to Employ Jeffrey N. Schatzman and the law firm of Schatzman & Schatzman, P.A. as Attorney for the Debtor in Possession [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
notice
UST Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 07/22 1:50 PM
Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Schneiderman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Verified Statement | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business
Mon 07/22 1:50 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 07/22 1:49 PM
Notice of Deadline to Correct Filing Deficiencies Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 7/29/2024].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 7/29/2024. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Saturday, July 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Sat 07/20 8:40 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor AB Brothers USA Inc.. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Sat 07/20 8:27 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Jeffrey N Schatzman. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
28
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Sat 07/20 8:26 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 09/30/2024. (Schatzman, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Sat 07/20 8:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-17288 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44545503. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |