BILLS v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03211 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
LILLY CORPORATE CENTER
INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46285 |
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
MISTY BILLS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 8:12 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
42
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/22 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT of MISTY BILLS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17616006.), filed by MISTY BILLS.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Mon 07/22 12:39 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-3211 (afm) |