NORWOOD v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03215 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
LEONARD NORWOOD
893 S. Delaware St. APT. H25
Lenoir, NC 28645 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: Jonathan Michael Sedgh on 7/23/24 (fdc) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/23 8:04 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-3215 (afm) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
44
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/22 12:27 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17616264.), filed by LEONARD NORWOOD.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |