RESTRICTED - ACCEPT NO FILINGS v. The Jewish Museum
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Holly A Brady |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00303 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 6:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Jewish Museum
|
|
Plaintiff
Mitch Taebel
2020 Golden Gate Dr
Long Beach, IN 46360 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 08/22 12:25 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2450 for5 Notice of Appeal filed by Mitch Taebel.(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Docketing, | ||
Att: 2 Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Wed 08/21 12:28 PM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re5 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (mrm) |
|
5 | 5
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Wed 08/21 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to2 Opinion and Order,3 Clerks Judgment by Mitch Taebel.(mrm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service
Mon 08/05 4:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Mitch Taebel. (nhc) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Judgment
Mon 07/29 10:56 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party certified mail #7099 3400 0003 4513 3388). (nhc) Modified on 7/29/2024 to add certified routing information (jdb) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/29 10:53 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DISMISSES Cause Nos. 1:24-CV-288 HAB-SLC and 1:24- CV-303 HAB-SLC WITH PREJUDICE; FINES Plaintiff Mitch Taebel $1,000.00 in each of the above cause numbers; IMPOSES a DISTRICT-WIDE FILING RESTRICTION prohibiting the Plaintiff from filing new civil cases in any court in the Northern District of Indiana or filing papers in any of his closed cases until he pays the fines. DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to return, unfiled, any attempts to file new cases, or papers in closed civil cases, by or on behalf of Plaintiff (except for a notice of appeal) until the fines are resolved. The CLERK is further directed to notify the Chief Judge of any attempted filings in violation of this ORDER. ADMONISHES the Plaintiff that attempts to file papers without first paying the fines may result in additional fines as sanctions for violating this Court's Order. The CLERK OF COURT is INSTRUCTED to distribute a copy of this Opinion and Order to all the Judges and Magistrate Judges in this District. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 7/25/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party certified mail #7099 3400 0003 4513 3388). (nhc) Modified on 7/29/2024 to add certified routing information (jdb) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Mon 07/22 3:46 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against The Jewish Museum, filed by Mitch Taebel. No IFP or filing fee received. (File stamped copy mailed to plaintiff)(mrm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |