Mitch Taebel v. Jewish Museum
Original Case: 1:24-cv-00303
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02450 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JEWISH MUSEUM
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MITCH TAEBEL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/22/2024 3:15 AM CDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Mitch Taebel by 08/28/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 09/04/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/04/2024 for Appellant Mitch Taebel. [1] [7400796] 24-2450 (PS) [Entered: 08/21/2024 02:48 PM] | |
Att: 1 9 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Fee Notice | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7400800] 24-2450 (PS) [Entered: 08/21/2024 02:55 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. These appeals will proceed to a determination of appellant?s fee status. JXK [3] [7400828] 24-2450 24-2451 (AP) [Entered: 08/21/2024 03:48 PM] |