JONES v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03266 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
100 COLLEGE ROAD WEST
PRINCETON, NJ 08540 |
|
Plaintiff
MARLIN JONES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/24/24 (dt) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 9:13 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3266. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/23 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND, against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CPAEDC-17620632.), filed by MARLIN JONES.(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |