RAYBORN v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03360 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 SCUDDERS MILL ROAD
PLAINSBORO, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
TAMMY RAYBORN
6405 FM 144 S
Daingerfield, TX 75638 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 1:50 PM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S and NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 7/26/24. (mbh) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 11:25 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3360. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 07/25 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626983.), filed by TAMMY RAYBORN.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |