Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01297 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 3:20 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA, in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT, in his official capacity as Director of the Division of Unemployment Insurance, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/19/2024 3:20 AM MDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
[11107131] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/24/2024. Notice of appearance due on 08/07/2024 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt, and Notice of appearance due on 08/23/2024 for Michael Villecco. 24-1297 | ||
Att: 1 19 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas | ||
2 pgs [11107207] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order fo this court. On or before 08/07/2024 appallant shall show cause in writing why he should not be required to prepay the $605 appellate filing fee. Alternatively, appellant may prepay the $605 appellate filing fee to the district court. See order for details. Served on 07/24/2024. 24-1297 |