BRAY v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03448 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL BRAY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/30 2:27 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC.. (amas) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/30 9:27 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3448. (sbt) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/29 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17633762.), filed by MICHAEL BRAY.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |