MATHIS v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03450 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
HOWARD MATHIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/30 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Jonathan Michael Sedgh on 7/30/24 (fdc) |
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 07/30 9:39 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Basis of Jurisdiction and Nature of Suit need to be checked off. (sbt) |
||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/30 9:40 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3450. (sbt) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/29 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17633849.), filed by HOWARD MATHIS.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |