MITZEL v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03522 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
100 COLLEGE ROAD WEST
PRINCETON, NJ 08540 |
|
Plaintiff
SARAH MITZEL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/31 8:27 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/31/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/31 7:14 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3522 (nd) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/30 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND, against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17637185.), filed by SARAH MITZEL.(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |