JOHNSON v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03533 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
MARIO JOHNSON
2767 N 37th St
Milwaukee, WI 53210 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/31 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/31/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/31 7:54 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3533 (nd) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/30 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17637749.), filed by MARIO JOHNSON.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |