LUNSFORD v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03534 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
DAWN LUNSFORD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/31 8:08 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/31/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/31 7:56 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3534 (nd) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/30 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17637732.), filed by DAWN LUNSFORD.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |