House v. ELI LILLY & COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03592 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 5:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY & COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
Ralphetta House
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/01 8:28 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY & COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/1/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/01 7:39 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3592 (nd) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/31 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17640690.), filed by Ralphetta House.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |