CONNER v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03595 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
LUCRETIA CONNER
745 Ed Youmans Road
Swainsboro, GA 30401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/01 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: Jonathan Michael Sedgh on 8/1/24 (fdc) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/01 7:48 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3595 (nd) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
42
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/31 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17640752.), filed by LUCRETIA CONNER.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |