BARAZA v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03598 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
ERICA BARAZA
811 South Millon Street
Gastonia, NC 28052 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/01 8:00 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3598 (nd) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
44
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/31 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17640822.), filed by ERICA BARAZA.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |