POE v. NOVO NORDISK INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03676 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC
|
|
Plaintiff
BRADLEY POE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler on behalf of BRADLEY POE (Pfeifler, Hannah) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/02 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/2/24. (mbh) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 08/02 7:59 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3676 (nd) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
59
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 08/01 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17644558.), filed by BRADLEY POE.(GUNTNER, DEBRA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |