PIHLKAR v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03721 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER PIHLKAR
61 Lawrence Rd
Kings Park, NY 11754 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
56
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 08/02 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17646421.), filed by JENNIFER PIHLKAR.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 08/02 1:47 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-3721 (afm) |