Chilson v. NOVO NORDISK INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03756 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Chilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/05 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/5/24 (dt) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
61
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 08/02 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17648008.), filed by Lorraine Chilson.(MIRACLE, TRENT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Sat 08/03 8:49 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3756 (nd) |