VEST v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03821 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 05, 2024 6:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
MONICA VEST
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/07 7:49 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/06 11:42 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3821. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/05 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17651596.), filed by MONICA VEST.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |