CARLISLE v. NOVO NORDISK INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03823 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC
|
|
Plaintiff
TAKEISHA CARLISLE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/06 1:22 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/6/2024. (ahf) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/06 4:40 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3823. (tjd) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/05 6:06 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17651609.), filed by TAKEISHA CARLISLE.(Silverman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |