HILL-GADDIS v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03824 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
893 S. DELAWARE STREET
INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46225 |
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
DENISE HILL-GADDIS
2318 Via Calle Ct
Durham, CA 95938 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/06 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/6/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/06 11:54 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3824. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
54
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/05 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17651615.), filed by DENISE HILL-GADDIS.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |